Roy v. Chili's of Kansas, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Georgia Roy
Defendant: Chili's of Kansas, Inc. and Faultless Laundry Company
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02565
Filed: October 18, 2010
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 14 defendant Chili's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 5/25/2011. (mss)
July 14, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Alter Judgment. The Court's Order of May 25, 2011 (Doc. 26) is VACATED, and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 7/13/2011. (alm)
November 8, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 78 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 11/8/2012. (mss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Roy v. Chili's of Kansas, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Roy
Represented By: R. Mark Nasteff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chili's of Kansas, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faultless Laundry Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]