Osborne v. C&D Complete Business Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joseph Osborne
Defendant: C&D Complete Business Solutions, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02335
Filed: June 16, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Linn
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: John W. Lungstrum
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion to Withdraw with instructions to corporate Defendant and STAYING CASE until 11/30/11 to allow corporate Defendant to retain counsel as required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/31/2011.Mailed to pro se party Kyle Cummings c/o C&D Complete Business Solutions by certified mail. (df)
April 9, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 56 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/9/2013. Mailed to both pro se Defendants by certified and regular mail. (df)
June 25, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/25/2013. Mailed to pro se parties C&D Complete Business Solutions, Sonya Cummings by certified mail. (df)
January 13, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 68 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/13/2014. Mailed to pro se defendants C&D Complete Business Solutions, Sonya Cummings by regular mail. (df)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Osborne v. C&D Complete Business Solutions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Osborne
Represented By: D. Matthew Durgin
Represented By: David M. Marco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&D Complete Business Solutions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]