Planned Parenthood of Kansas and Mid-Missouri v. Brownback et al

Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Kansas and Mid-Missouri
Defendant: Sam Brownback and Robert Moser
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02357
Filed: June 27, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motions 101 and 102 for Extension of Preliminary Injunction. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 6/29/2012. (jlw)
August 1, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 4 plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 8/1/2011. (mss)
August 17, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 43 defendants' Motion to Stay; and denying 47 plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 8/17/2011. (mss)
August 30, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 52 defendants' Motion to Clarify. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 8/30/2011. (mss)
October 11, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 65 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/11/2011. (jlw)
October 18, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding 73 Intervenor Dodge City Family Planning Clinic, Inc's Motion for TRO as moot; and granting 73 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/18/2011. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Planned Parenthood of Kansas and Mid-Missouri v. Brownback et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Kansas and Mid-Missouri
Represented By: Grace Pickering
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Roger K. Evans
Represented By: Elissa J. Preheim
Represented By: Erin C. Thompson
Represented By: Lee Thompson
Represented By: Sarah E. Warlick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Brownback
Represented By: James M. Armstrong
Represented By: Gary L. Ayers
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Chanay
Represented By: Steve R. Fabert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Moser
Represented By: James M. Armstrong
Represented By: Gary L. Ayers
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Chanay
Represented By: Steve R. Fabert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]