Riederer v. Anchor General Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Albert A. Riederer
Defendant: Anchor General Insurance Company, Anchor General Insurance Agency, Inc., Progressive Corporation, RSI International, Inc., Safeway Insurance Company, Southeast Fidelity Corporation, Seminole Casualty Insurance Co., Smith Bell & Thompson, Inc., Southern General Agency, Inc. and Special Risks Facilities, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02380
Filed: June 23, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
 
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2012 32 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss.. The motion is granted with respect to Counts I and IV of the amended complaint, which are hereby dismissed. The Trustee is granted leave to file, on or before January 27, 2012, a second amended complaint stating a cognizable and plausible claim for fraudulent transfer in accordance with this opinion. The motion is denied with respect to Counts II and III. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/13/2012. (ses)
April 26, 2012 60 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the protective order submitted by the parties, but with modifications to paragraphs 2, 8, and 12 to conform to the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, District of Kansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/26/2012. (ah)
June 12, 2012 65 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. The motion is granted as unopposed with respect to Count I of the second amended complaint and with respect to Count III to the extent based on state law, and those claims are hereby dismissed. The motion is denied with respect to Count II and with respect to Count III to the extent based on federal law. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 6/12/2012. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Riederer v. Anchor General Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert A. Riederer
Represented By: Michael D. Fielding
Represented By: John J. Cruciani
Represented By: Douglas J. Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor General Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor General Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Corporation
Represented By: Mark A. Shaiken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSI International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Fidelity Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole Casualty Insurance Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Bell & Thompson, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern General Agency, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Risks Facilities, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]