American Civil Liberties Union of Kansas and Western Missouri v. Praeger

Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Kansas and Western Missouri
Defendant: Sandy Praeger
Case Number: 2:2011cv02462
Filed: August 16, 2011
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wesley E. Brown
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting 17 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's Objection to the Report and Recommendation is denied as moot. The Court directs the Magistrate Judge to set an expedited schedule for discovery and the filing of dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 9/29/2011. (alm)
March 29, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 29 Defendant's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/29/2012. (pp)
January 7, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 65 Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment on the question of whethe r the Act's predominant purpose was to impose an undue burden on abortion rights is granted. Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment on the question of whether the Act has the effect of imposing a substantial obstacle on a woman's right to an abortion will be denied. This issue remains to be decided at trial. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 1/7/2013. (pp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Kansas and Western Missouri v. Praeger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Kansas and Western Missouri
Represented By: Andrew D. Beck
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Represented By: Stephen D. Bonney
Represented By: Jennifer Dalven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Praeger
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Chanay
Represented By: Stephen R. McAllister
Represented By: Shon D. Qualseth
Represented By: Robert W. Ramsdell
Represented By: Todd N. Thompson
Represented By: Sarah E. Warner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]