Stanton v. The Greens at Shawnee Apartments Management Company et al

Defendant: Lindsey Management Company, Inc., John Doe 1-3 and The Greens at Shawnee Apartments Management Company
Plaintiff: Loralee Stanton
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02478
Filed: August 24, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2012 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/15/2012. (mm)
January 4, 2013 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 38 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/4/2013. (mm)
January 25, 2013 52 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 44 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Treating Physicians. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/24/2013. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stanton v. The Greens at Shawnee Apartments Management Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Represented By: Richmond M. Enochs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-3
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Greens at Shawnee Apartments Management Company
Represented By: Richmond M. Enochs
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loralee Stanton
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]