Bank of America, N.A. et al v. Kansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC

Counter_defendant: Ruth Hanna, Thomas Millar, 75th Metcalf Associates, LLC, Bank of America, N.A. and Nancy Gee
Plaintiff: Nancy Gee, Ruth Hanna, Thomas Millar, Bank of America, N.A. and 75th Metcalf Associates, LLC
Defendant: Kansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Counter_claimant: Kansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv02481
Filed: August 25, 2011
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 106 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 5/29/14. (jlw)
September 26, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling Defendant's 13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Further, sustaining Plaintiffs' 15 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/25/2012. (mg)
November 26, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 25 Motion to Certify. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 11/26/2012. (ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. et al v. Kansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Ruth Hanna
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Thomas Millar
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: 75th Metcalf Associates, LLC
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Nancy Gee
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Gee
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Hanna
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Millar
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 75th Metcalf Associates, LLC
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Represented By: Stewart M. Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Brown
Represented By: Anna M. Wenzel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Brown
Represented By: Anna M. Wenzel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]