McDaniel-Sharp v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara McDaniel-Sharp
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02518
Filed: September 15, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Referring Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 22 Motion to Exclude. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/18/2012. (mem)
February 8, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion for a Modification of the Scheduling Order and Extension of Time for the Designation of Dr. Bernhardt's Deposition 49 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the scheduling order is modified to reflect an extension of time for the designation of Dr. Bernhardt's deposition testimony to February 26, 2013, and the deadline for counter-designations and objections to March 1, 2013. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 2/8/2013. (mh)
March 8, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by clerk on 3/8/2013. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McDaniel-Sharp v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E. Benevides
Represented By: L. J. Buckner, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara McDaniel-Sharp
Represented By: D. Richard White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]