Sanders et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mark Sanders and Pamela Sanders
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02540
Filed: September 26, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Referring Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 60 Motion to Strike Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/13/2013. (cm)
May 2, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Within thirty days of the date of this order or at such other time to which the parties may agree, Plaintiff shall present Salvatore J. Ghertkin for a supplemental deposition at the offices of counsel for Defendants in Kansas City or at any other location to which the parties may agree. The motion is otherwise denied. The parties shall be responsible for their own expenses on the motion. See Memorandum and Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 5/2/2013. (bw)
December 4, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant's Motion for Protective Order from Corporate Representative Deposition Notice. For good cause shown, Topic 2(b) and Requests 4 and 5 are limited or modified as set out in the Memorandum and Order. The motion is otherwise denied. The parties shall be responsible for their own expenses on the motion. See Memorandum and Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 12/4/2012. (bw)
December 10, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 72 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery for failure of the movants to fulfill the duty to confer required by D. Kan. Rule 37.2. See Memorandum and Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 12/10/2012. (bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sanders et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sanders
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Represented By: Charles D. Kugler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Sanders
Represented By: Charles D. Kugler
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Donnelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]