Wyandotte Nation v. Salazar

Plaintiff: Wyandotte Nation
Defendant: Kenneth L. Salazar
Movant: State of Kansas
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02656
Filed: December 5, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2012 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Intervene as a Defendant by State of Kansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 4/11/2012. (kao)
July 3, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. The Court directs the Secretary and the State to submit supplemental briefs addressing the impact of Patchak on the subject matter jurisdiction issues raised in the Secretary's motion to dismiss and the St ate's response thereto. The Secretary's brief shall be filed on or before fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order; the State's response shall be filed within fourteen (14) days thereafter; there will be no reply. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/3/2012. (pp)
August 3, 2012 56 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 47 Motion to Dismiss. The State's counterclaims against the Nation and cross-claims against the Secretary are DISMISSED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BY THE COURT that within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall confer and submit a proposed schedule for resolving the remaining claims in this dispute, including a response or submission by the State as it sees necessary. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/3/2012. (pp)
April 10, 2013 83 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See Order for details.) Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/10/2013. (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wyandotte Nation v. Salazar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyandotte Nation
Represented By: David McCullough
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lambiotte
Represented By: William W. Hutton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Salazar
Represented By: Kristofor R. Swanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: State of Kansas
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Chanay
Represented By: Mark S. Gunnison
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Represented By: Christopher J. Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]