Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company, LP
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation, Comcast IP Phone, LLC and Comcast Phone of Kansas LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02684
Filed: December 19, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2014 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/11/2014. (ah)
April 18, 2014 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 192 motion for partial reconsideration of the February 11, 2014 order (ECF doc. 177); denying 153 motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/18/2014. (ah)
May 6, 2014 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 178 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/6/2014. (ah)
July 22, 2014 318 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Objections 245 to the Orders by which the Magistrate Judge denied defendants' motion to compel are sustained in part and overruled in part. The Court concludes that Sprint did waive the attorney-client privilege with respect to the subject of an outside law firm's legal advice concerning possible infringement by Vonage, and defendants' objections are sustained to that extent. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Sprint must modify i ts privilege log and produce as appropriate all documents responsive to Request No. 43 that fall within the scope of the waiver as determined by this Court (subject to any other remaining applicable objections). The objections are otherwise denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/22/2014. (ses)
October 9, 2014 435 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is ordered that certain terms in the patents at issue in this action are construed as set forth herein. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/09/2014. (ses)
October 31, 2014 477 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's objections 409 to the Magistrate Judge's Order of September 12, 2014, are hereby overruled, and defendant Comcast shall produce to plaintiff an unredacted copy of the e-mail at issue by November 7, 2014. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/31/2014. (ses)
January 31, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling defendants' 42 Motion To Transfer Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1404. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 1/31/2013. (mg)
June 7, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding protocol for ESI and paper documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/7/2013. (kg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company, LP
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Represented By: Adam P. Seitz
Represented By: Jason R. Mudd
Represented By: Paul R. Hart
Represented By: Eric A. Buresh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Paul S. Penticuff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Paul S. Penticuff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast IP Phone, LLC
Represented By: Paul S. Penticuff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Phone of Kansas LLC
Represented By: Paul S. Penticuff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]