Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Cable One, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company, LP
Defendant: Cable One, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02685
Filed: December 19, 2011
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Rogers
Referring Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 91 Defendant's Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/23/2014. (ses)
October 9, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is ordered that certain terms in the patents at issue in this action are construed as set forth herein. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/09/2014. (ses)
December 16, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 motion for leave to file second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/16/2013. (ah)
February 14, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 73 Plaintiff's Objection to the Order of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 2/14/2014. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Cable One, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company, LP
Represented By: Paul R. Hart
Represented By: Eric A. Buresh
Represented By: Jason R. Mudd
Represented By: Adam P. Seitz
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable One, Inc.
Represented By: Jay F. Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]