Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Time Warner Cable Inc. et al

Defendant: TWC Communications, LLC, Time Warner Cable Information Services (Kansas), LLC, Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC, Time Warner Entertainment Company, L.P. and Time Warner Entertainment-Advance/Newhouse Partnership
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company, LP
Case Number: 2:2011cv02686
Filed: December 19, 2011
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Johnson
Referring Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER memorializing rulings made during November 14, 2014 status conference regarding representation of Craig Cowden. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/14/2014. (ah)
January 22, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 39 defendants' Motion to Transfer Case; and denying as moot 49 defendants' Motion to Sever and Stay. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/18/2013. (mss)
December 16, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 motion for leave to file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/16/2013. (ah)
October 9, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is ordered that certain terms in the patents at issue in this action are construed as set forth herein.Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/09/2014. (ses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Time Warner Cable Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWC Communications, LLC
Represented By: Terrence J. Campbell
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Information Services (Kansas), LLC
Represented By: Terrence J. Campbell
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Inc.
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Represented By: Terrence J. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable LLC
Represented By: Terrence J. Campbell
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Entertainment Company, L.P.
Represented By: Terrence J. Campbell
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Entertainment-Advance/Newhouse Partnership
Represented By: Terrence J. Campbell
Represented By: Catherine C. Theisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company, LP
Represented By: Basil Trent Webb
Represented By: Adam P. Seitz
Represented By: Jason R. Mudd
Represented By: Paul R. Hart
Represented By: Eric A. Buresh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]