ConAgra Foods Food Ingredients Company, Incorporated v. Archer Daniels Midland Company

Plaintiff: ConAgra Foods Food Ingredients Company, Incorporated
Defendant: Archer Daniels Midland Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv02171
Filed: March 21, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Referring Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 83 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/3/2014. (cm)
April 18, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 4/18/14. (bh)
December 17, 2014 246 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion to Compel; granting 201 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 12/17/14. (bh)
June 5, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 59 Markman Brief filed by Archer Daniels Midland Company, 55 Markman Brief, filed by ConAgra Foods Food Ingredients Company, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/5/2013. (cm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ConAgra Foods Food Ingredients Company, Incorporated v. Archer Daniels Midland Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ConAgra Foods Food Ingredients Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Peter C. Knops
Represented By: Lynn C. Herndon
Represented By: B. Trent Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Daniels Midland Company
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]