Webster Capital Finance, Inc v. Newby et al

Plaintiff: Webster Capital Finance, Inc
Defendant: Daniel Newby and Thomacine Newby
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02290
Filed: May 15, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Referring Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 15 Motion to Stay Case; finding as moot 22 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 23 Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous; denying 24 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous; denying without prejudice 29 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/14/2013. (cm)
May 30, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 36 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demand. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/30/2013. (cm)
June 26, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 54 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/26/2013. (cm)
August 2, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/2/2013. (aa)
February 21, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 65 Motion for Attorney Fees in an amount of $64,784.06; denying 66 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 66 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 69 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/21/2014. (cm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Webster Capital Finance, Inc v. Newby et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webster Capital Finance, Inc
Represented By: James F. Freeman, III
Represented By: Evan S. Goldstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Newby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomacine Newby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]