Hammer et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al

Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Sam's East, Inc. and Sam's West, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven E. Hammer and Michael D. White
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02618
Filed: September 19, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: Gerald L. Rushfelt
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 17 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 14 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal.. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 11/8/2012. (mem)
November 27, 2012 23 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiffs must file an unredacted copy of their complaint (Doc. 1) on or before November 29, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants must file an unredacted copy of their memorandum (Doc. 18) on or before November 29, 2 012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future pleadings by both parties are to be filed without redactions and that requests for leave to file under seal must be made by formal motion. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 11/27/2012. (mm) Modified on 11/28/2012. (WO) (lak)
June 25, 2013 50 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 33 Defendants' Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery and 40 Defendants Motion for Protective Order. For the reasons stated in the Memorandum and Order, the Court denies the motions. Because the circumstances make an award of expenses unjust, the parties are each responsible for their own expenses incurred on the motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 6/25/2013. (bw)
July 16, 2013 51 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims are dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 7/16/2013. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hammer et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca J. Schwartz
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Scott H. Aripoli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Rebecca J. Schwartz
Represented By: Scott H. Aripoli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Rebecca J. Schwartz
Represented By: Scott H. Aripoli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E. Hammer
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: Karen D. Renwick
Represented By: Jerome M. Patience
Represented By: Kelly L. McClelland
Represented By: Matthew R. Crimmins
Represented By: Kenneth E. Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. White
Represented By: Jerome M. Patience
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Represented By: Karen D. Renwick
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: Matthew R. Crimmins
Represented By: Kelly L. McClelland
Represented By: Kenneth E. Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]