Lee v. Kansas State University et al

Plaintiff: Grace Lee
Defendant: Kansas State University, Haiyan Wang, Heather M. Reed, Carol W. Shanklin, James A. Guikema, Duane W. Crawford and James W. Neill
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02638
Filed: September 28, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Riley
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/7/2012. (aam)
June 7, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. Motion is granted with respect to counts 2-10 and with respect to all claims against KSU and against other defendants in their official capacities. Granting in part and denying in part with respect to count 1. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/7/2013. (mb)
March 14, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 32 Motion to Stay Discovery. All discovery is hereby stayed as to Defendants Dr. Carol W. Shanklin, Dr. Duane W. Crawford, Dr. Haiyan Wang, and Heather M. Reed until such time as the Court rules on 30 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/14/2014. (do)
March 14, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/14/2014. (do)
August 20, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED BY THE COURT that the stay of discovery and other Rule 26 activities shall be LIFTED. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/20/14. (hw)
September 24, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 60 Motion to Withdraw as Plaintiff's Attorney. Attorneys Clifford A. Cohen and Austin B. Hayden are authorized to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Grace Lee in this case. All further service upon Grace Lee shall be sent to 198 Mount Vernon Street, Apt. S1, Malden MA 02148. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 09/24/2014.Mailed to pro se party Grace Lee by regular mail. (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lee v. Kansas State University et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Lee
Represented By: Austin B. Hayden
Represented By: Clifford A. Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas State University
Represented By: M. J. Willoughby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haiyan Wang
Represented By: M. J. Willoughby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather M. Reed
Represented By: M. J. Willoughby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol W. Shanklin
Represented By: M. J. Willoughby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Guikema
Represented By: M. J. Willoughby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane W. Crawford
Represented By: M. J. Willoughby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Neill
Represented By: M. J. Willoughby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]