Gassaway v. Jarden Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Coley Gassaway
Defendant: Jarden Corporation, Sunbeam Products, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Clyde Yost, Yost Enterprises and National Property Inspections of Kansas
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02769
Filed: December 7, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 102 Featured Case ORDER denying 83 motion for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/19/2013. (mb)
January 22, 2013 13 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 7 defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/18/2013. (mss)
September 3, 2013 78 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 plaintiff's motion to compel discovery from defendant Sunbeam. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/3/2013. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gassaway v. Jarden Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coley Gassaway
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarden Corporation
Represented By: Kristi L. Burmeister
Represented By: Timothy E. Congrove
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy E. Congrove
Represented By: Kristi L. Burmeister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Kristi L. Burmeister
Represented By: Timothy E. Congrove
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Yost
Represented By: Adam L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yost Enterprises
Represented By: Adam L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Property Inspections of Kansas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]