Yarbary v. Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer L.L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Kristopher D. Yarbary
Defendant: Dolly Pearl Evans, William S. Towles, III, UNUM Group Corporation and Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer LLP
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02773
Filed: December 10, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting defendant's 74 Motion to Dismiss. Further, granting defendant UNUM's 137 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Mabone's claims against all defendants are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/18/2013. (mg)
April 25, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying plaintiff's 155 Motion to Recuse Magistrate Judge David Waxse and District Judge Carlos Murguia; denying plaintiff's 150 Motion to Reconsider Non-Dispositive Order; denying plaintiff's 147 Motion to C ompel Defendants to Answer Complaint; denying plaintiff's 166 Motion to Reconsider Dispositive Order (Doc. 159 ) Granting MPOWB Defendants and UNUM Defendants Motion to Dismiss; granting defendants Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer, LL P's, Martin Bauer's, David Wooding's, Jeff Spahn, Jr.'s, Michael Jones's, and Richard Thompson's 100 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Kristopher Yarbary's Claim for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Gra nted; granting The UNUM Defendants' 152 Motion to Dismiss or StrikePlaintiff Yarbary's Fourth Amended Civil Complaint; and denying plaintiff's 157 Motion for Leave to File 5th Amended Complaint. Further, plaintiff's claims against all defendants are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim. The case is closed. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 04/24/2014. (mg)
June 12, 2014 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying plaintiff Kristopher Yarbary's 174 Motion for Relief from an Order, and 177 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 06/11/2014. (mg)
March 12, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case 12-2773-CM-DJW is designated as lead case. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/12/2013.Mailed to pro se party Kristopher D. Yarbary by regular mail. (mm)
April 10, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying defendant Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer, LLP's 26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Proper Service of Process. Further, plaintiff Yarbary's service of summons against Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer, LLP is quashed. Plaintiff Yarbary has until 04/24/2013 to properly serve Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer, LLP. If plaintiff Yarbary fails to properly serve defendant by that time, plaintiff faces possible dismissal of the action again st defendant MPOWB without prejudice. Plaintiff Mabone's service of summons against Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer, LLP is quashed. Plaintiff Mabone has until 04/24/2013 to properly serve Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer, LLP. If plaintiff Mabone fails to properly serve defendant by that time, plaintiff faces possible dismissal of the action against defendant MPOWB without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 4/10/2013. (mg)
October 10, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Plaintiff Yarbary's Motion for Leave for Joinder of Parties; granting 88 Plaintiff Yarbary's Motion for Leave to File 4th Amended Complaint; and finding as moot 80 Plaintiff Yarbary's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/10/2013. (Mailed to pro se plaintiffs by regular mail.) (byk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Yarbary v. Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer L.L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher D. Yarbary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolly Pearl Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Towles, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Group Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin, Pringle, Oliver, Wallace & Bauer LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]