Monroe v. City of Lawrence, Kansas et al

Defendant: City of Lawrence, Kansas and Tarik Khatib
Plaintiff: Michael Monroe
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02086
Filed: February 19, 2013
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying in part and granting in part 89 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. The motion is denied in all respects except that it is granted as to limiting the temporal scope of certain discovery. The Scheduling Order is hereby amended to reflect the limits on the temporal scope of certain discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 05/13/2014. (ts)
November 21, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 34 Motion to Stay Discovery. All discovery is hereby stayed as to both Defendants until such time as the Court rules on 23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/21/2013. (do)
December 20, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 41 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/20/2013. (do)
January 27, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 1/27/2014. (cm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Monroe v. City of Lawrence, Kansas et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lawrence, Kansas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarik Khatib
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Monroe
Represented By: Katherine A. Worthington
Represented By: Katherine I. Tracy
Represented By: Joseph R. Colantuono
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]