Birdsong et al v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, KS et al

Defendant: Michael Mills, Rick Armstrong, Sam Breshears, Jeffery Bell, P. J. Locke, Travis Toms, Joseph Reyes, Steve Haulmark, Nathan Doleshal, Phil Trusskey, Stewart Littlefield, John Doe 1-10 and Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, KS
Plaintiff: Jerome Birdsong and Rocio Dominguez
Case Number: 2:2013cv02090
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 35 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motions to dismiss no later than August 26, 2013. The Court will not favorably entertain any further requests for extension of this deadline. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/2/2013. (ms)
January 10, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint in accordance with the Courts ruling by no later than February 7, 2014. 13 Motion to Dismiss Counts 11, 12, 13, 14, and 15 of the First Amended Complaint and 20 Motion to Dismiss are moot. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 1/10/2014. (mb)
May 29, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 61 Defendants Mills and Bell's Motion for More Definite Statement. Defendants Mills and Bell shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/29/2014. (byk)
July 9, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 74 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying 82 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/9/14. (hw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birdsong et al v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, KS et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mills
Represented By: Sean P. McCauley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Armstrong
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Breshears
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Bell
Represented By: Sean P. McCauley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. J. Locke
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Toms
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Reyes
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Haulmark
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Doleshal
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Trusskey
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Littlefield
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, KS
Represented By: Jennifer L. Myers
Represented By: Henry E. Couchman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Birdsong
Represented By: Rebecca D. Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocio Dominguez
Represented By: Rebecca D. Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]