Chen v. Dillard Store Services, Inc.

Defendant: Dillard Store Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ivan Chen
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02358
Filed: July 18, 2013
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 12 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/16/2013. Mailed to pro se party Ivan Chen by regular mail. (mh)
October 17, 2013 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/17/2013. Mailed to pro se party Ivan Chen by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3460 0000 8262 3671. (mh)
January 13, 2014 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 32 Motion to Alter Judgment and denying 30 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/10/2014. Mailed to pro se party Ivan Chen by regular mail. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chen v. Dillard Store Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard Store Services, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Kessler Cain(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Chen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]