Jenkins-Dyer v. Drayton et al

Defendant: Anita L. Drayton and Exxon Mobil Corporation
Plaintiff: Isoke N. Jenkins-Dyer
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02489
Filed: September 18, 2013
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Wyandotte
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Within 7 days of the date of this order, Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation shall electronically file and serve its surreply to 23 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 2/5/2014. (do)
May 27, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 05/27/2014. (ts)
August 29, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot and therefore denied 57 Defendants' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants Exxon a nd Garrison's Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Objection to Magistrate's Order, granting 74 and 72 Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying without prejudice 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/28/14. (hw)
October 16, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 53 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 55 Motion to Dismiss; denying 58 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/16/14. (hw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jenkins-Dyer v. Drayton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita L. Drayton
Represented By: W. Greg Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Scott C. Hecht(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher J. Leopold(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isoke N. Jenkins-Dyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]