Baer v. Daley et al

Plaintiff: Robert L. Baer
Defendant: Bradford L. Daley, Terry Yarham, Lori Yarham, Integrity Debt Option Group and Court Mediation Services
Case Number: 5:2012cv04086
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Shawnee
Referring Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 9 Defendant Bradford Daley's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/22/2012.Mailed to pro se party Bradford Daley, 51 Lee Road 987, Phenix City, AL 36870 by regular mail. (pp)
June 17, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 17 Motion for Reconsideration and denying 19 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/17/2013. Mailed to pro se party Bradford L. Daley by regular mail. (ms)
September 16, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 21 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/16/2013.Mailed to pro se party Bradford Lamar Daley by regular mail (daw)
July 24, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/24/2012.Mailed to pro se party Bradford Daley, 51 Lee Road 987, Phenix City, AL 36870 by regular mail. (pp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baer v. Daley et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Baer
Represented By: Martin J. Peck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford L. Daley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Yarham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Yarham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Debt Option Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Court Mediation Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]