Payton (ID 66352) v. Werholtz et al

Respondent: Roger Werholtz, FNU LNU, Kansas, State of, Ray Roberts and Derek Schmidt
Petitioner: Walter Almon Payton
Case Number: 5:2013cv03066
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Reno
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion 7 for reconsideration is construed as a motion pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 59(e) and is denied. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 5/21/2013. (Mailed to pro se party Walter Almon Payton by regular mail.) (smnd)
June 4, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion 14 to alter or amend and motion 15 to compel disclosure are denied. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 6/4/2013. (Mailed to pro se party Walter Almon Payton by regular mail.) (smnd)
April 29, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court grants Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 3 ); it is further ordered this matter is dismissed; and the court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 4/29/2013. (Mailed to pro se party Walter Almon Payton by regular mail.) (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payton (ID 66352) v. Werholtz et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roger Werholtz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FNU LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kansas, State of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ray Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Derek Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walter Almon Payton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]