Hershey v. ExxonMobil Oil Corporation

Plaintiff: Jimmie Hershey
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Case Number: 6:2007cv01300
Filed: September 26, 2007
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Stevens
Referring Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 118 Plaintiff's uncontested Motion to Strike. The clerk of the court shall take appropriate steps to strike Doc. 117 from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 11/5/10. (sj)
March 31, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 88 Motion to Certify Class; denying 101 Motion for Hearing; overruling 123 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge; denying as moot 125 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 132 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/31/2011. (alm)
December 22, 2011 182 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 137 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 12/21/2011. (mss)
April 11, 2012 207 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 157 plaintiff's Motion for Order. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4/11/2012. (mss)
August 24, 2012 307 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 291 Farrar Class Representatives' Motion to Intervene; denying 295 Farrar Class Representatives' Motion for Partial Dissolution; and denying 297 Farrar Class Representatives' Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 8/24/2012. (mss)
September 5, 2012 312 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 216 Farrar class members' Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 9/5/2012. (mss)
October 3, 2012 351 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 310 Farrar class Motion for Reconsideration; denying 319 Farrar class Motion for Order; and denying 310 Farrar class Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/3/2012. (mss)
October 5, 2012 355 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 323 Objector Keith Farrar's Motion for Discovery. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/5/2012. (mss)
October 26, 2012 404 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 333 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 337 Motion for Order; granting 371 Motion to Strike; granting 385 Motion to Strike; granting 388 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; denying 391 Motion for Order; granting 393 Motion to Strike; and granting 313 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/26/2012. (mss)
October 26, 2012 406 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/26/2012. (mss)
January 4, 2013 420 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 413 plaintiff class's Motion for Appeal Bond. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/4/2013. (mss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hershey v. ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Hershey
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Arthur S. Chalmers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]