K R Smith Trucking LLC v. PACCAR Inc. et al

Plaintiff: K R Smith Trucking LLC
Defendant: PACCAR Inc. and Peterbilt Motors Company
 
Case Number: 6:2008cv01351
Filed: November 7, 2008
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Donald W. Bostwick
Presiding Judge: Wesley E. Brown
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2011 108 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 84 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 88 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; granting 98 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 88 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 88 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 7/27/2011. (alm)
October 23, 2009 21 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 10/23/2009. (aa)
April 1, 2010 50 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 34 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 4/1/2010. (Bostwick, Donald)
July 19, 2010 70 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 46 Defendants' Motion for Order to amend the caption. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 7/19/2010. (Bostwick, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: K R Smith Trucking LLC v. PACCAR Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K R Smith Trucking LLC
Represented By: Eldon L. Boisseau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt Motors Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]