Smith v. Wheatland Electric Cooperative, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mark A. Smith
Defendant: Wheatland Electric Cooperative, Inc.
 
Case Number: 6:2010cv01237
Filed: July 22, 2010
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Donald W. Bostwick
Presiding Judge: Wesley E. Brown
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 35 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/13/2012. (df)
June 19, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 56 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/19/2012. (df)
August 2, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Amended Motion for Leave to Add Witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/2/2012. (df)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith v. Wheatland Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Smith
Represented By: Robert A. Levy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheatland Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]