Orr v. Riederer

Plaintiff: Robert D. Orr
Defendant: Albert A. Riederer
Case Number: 6:2010cv01303
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 111 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 112 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 114 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The case is closed. See Memorandum and Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 7/3/2012. (jw)
October 12, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 4 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas in Kansas City, Kansas. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/12/2010. (jw)
November 1, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER with modifications to proposed paragraph 5. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/1/10.(ah)
December 21, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Defendant Albert A. Riederer's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/21/2010. (jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. Riederer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Orr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert A. Riederer
Represented By: Peggy A. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]