Pouncil v. Branch Law Firm et al

Plaintiff: Altina Pouncil
Defendant: Branch Law Firm and Turner Branch
 
Case Number: 6:2010cv01314
Filed: September 15, 2010
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2011 102 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 86 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall electronically file her proposed First Amended Complaint forthwith. It is further ordered that the 11/22/2011 Final Pretrial Conference is converted to a telephone status conference. The Court will initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 11/21/2011. (byk)
December 13, 2011 110 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 74 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Fully Comply with Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Requests for Production. Within thirty (30) days of this Memorandum and Order, Defendants shall serve, with out objection, their answers to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories Nos. 26-32 and produce documents responsive to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production Nos. 2-4, and 7. It is further ordered that each party shall bear its own fees and expenses related to this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 12/13/2011. (byk)
March 7, 2012 135 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Fully Comply with Certain Interrogatories and Requests for Production. By 3/16/2012, Plaintiff's counsel shall file an affidavit itemi zing the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, that Plaintiff incurred in bringing this Motion to Compel. Defendants shall have until 3/30/2012 to file any response to the affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 3/7/2012. (byk)
March 12, 2012 139 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 117 defendants' Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/12/2012. (mss)
October 21, 2011 94 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Fully Comply With Requests for Production. Plaintiff's request to compel production of Mr. Branch's letter to Ms. Ferrera (BLF01 058-BLF01064) is granted. Defendants shall produce Mr. Branch's letter to Ms. Ferrera (BLF01058-BLF01064) within seven (7) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff's request to compel production of Mr. Branch's letter to Colony Insurance (BLF01031-BLF01032) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 10/21/2011. (byk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pouncil v. Branch Law Firm et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altina Pouncil
Represented By: Tyson C. Langhofer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Branch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]