Berg v. Frobish et al

Counter_defendant: Jerry L. Berg
Counter_claimant: Cedar Lakes Village Condominium Association, Gary Fugit, Simon Palmer Properties, Inc., Jon L. Frobish and Cross Real Estate Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Berg
Defendant: Jon L. Frobish, Gary Fugit, Cross Real Estate Management, LLC, Cedar Lakes Village Condominium Association and Simon Palmer Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2012cv01123
Filed: April 5, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 78 Motion to Amend Complaint.; denying 89 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/15/2012. (df)
November 20, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 80 Motion for a Mental Evaluation of the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/20/2012. (df)
March 11, 2013 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in its entirety, Report and Recommendations regarding 109 Report and Recommendations. Further, defendants' 126 Objections to 109 Report and Recommendations are overruled. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/11/2013. (mg)
May 9, 2013 247 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion for Protective Order; granting 244 Motion to Supplement Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/9/2013. (df)
June 4, 2013 319 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling plaintiff's 105 Motion To Dismiss Counterclaim For Breach Of Contract And Proposed Second Amended Cause For Breach Of Contract (Covenant Of Land Use Rights) For Failure To Plead A Justiciable Cause Of Action. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/4/2013. (mg)
July 3, 2013 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: 203 Memorandum and Report and Recommendations are adopted in their entirety. Further, plaintiff's 115 Motion For Emergency Preliminary Injunction For Order To Compel Budget, Records And Access To Meetings Or For A Writ Of Mandamus is overruled. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 7/3/2013. (mg)
December 12, 2013 372 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining Defendants' 351 Motion for Summary Judgment. Further, overruling as moot all other pending motions. The case is hereby remanded to the District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 12/12/2013. (mg)
October 2, 2014 389 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding 383 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 384 Objection to Findings of Fact, Conclusionsof Law and Recommendations In Report and Recommendation on Defendants' Motion For Legal Fees is overruled. The 385 Objection of Defendants to Report and Recommendation of Magistrate on Defendants' Motion For Legal Fees is overruled. Further, the 383 Report and Recommendation on Defendants' MotionFor Legal Fees is adopted in its entirety. Defendants' 374 Motion for Legal Fees is overruled. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 10/02/2014. (mg)
July 31, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 25 Motion to Strike ; denying 10 Motion for Protective Order; denying 16 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/31/2012. (df)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. Frobish et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jerry L. Berg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cedar Lakes Village Condominium Association
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Gary Fugit
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Simon Palmer Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jon L. Frobish
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cross Real Estate Management, LLC
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Berg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon L. Frobish
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Fugit
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Real Estate Management, LLC
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Lakes Village Condominium Association
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Palmer Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Simmons
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]