Proud Veterans, LLC v. Ari Ben-Menashe et al

Defendant: Ari Ben-Menashe, William Schaap, Sergejs Ovjannikovs, Traeger Resources and Logistics, Inc., Dickens and Madson Canada, Inc. and Andre Maritime Agency Co.
Plaintiff: Proud Veterans, LLC
Case Number: 6:2012cv01126
Filed: April 6, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 22 Motion for an Order Providing for Jurisdictional Discovery. Discovery shall be limited to the issue of personal jurisdiction and venue and shall not include the substantive claims in this case. Defendants shall not be required to travel to Kansas for depositions or be required to make documents available in Kansas. The limited jurisdictional discovery shall be completed by January 31, 2013. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 12/21/2012. (pp)
February 27, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss. This action shall be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. Parties shall file any motionsto transfer and/or briefs regarding whether transfer of this case would be in the interest o f justice under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1406 or 1631 within fourteen (14) days of this order, and any responses shall be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Plaintiff's motions and memoranda in support and/or briefs shall be no longer than seven pages. Defendants' collective motions and memoranda in support and/or briefs shall be no longer than seven pages. Replies will not be allowed. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 2/26/14. (mb)
April 2, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 39 Motion to Transfer Case; granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is further ordered that this case shall be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 04/02/14. (hs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proud Veterans, LLC v. Ari Ben-Menashe et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Ben-Menashe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Schaap
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergejs Ovjannikovs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traeger Resources and Logistics, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickens and Madson Canada, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Maritime Agency Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Proud Veterans, LLC
Represented By: J. Joseph Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]