Blue et al v. Farm, Inc., The et al

Plaintiff: Anita K. Blue and Nicholas A. Blue
Defendant: K.D.H.E. and Farm, Inc., The
 
Case Number: 6:2013cv01132
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 13 defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 18 defendant's Motion for Judgment; and granting 25 defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/18/14. Mailed to pro se parties Anita K. Blue and Nicholas A. Blue by regular mail. (mss)
April 23, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/23/2013.Mailed to pro se party Anita Blue, Nicholas Blue by certified mail. (df) Modified on 4/23/2013 to add Plaintiff name for service (alm).
June 11, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/11/2013.Mailed to pro se party Anita Blue, Nicholas Blue by regular mail. (df)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blue et al v. Farm, Inc., The et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita K. Blue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas A. Blue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.D.H.E.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm, Inc., The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]