Rogers v. Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Shelli F. Rogers
 
Case Number: 6:2013cv01333
Filed: September 9, 2013
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Strike as Untimely Defendant's 9 Motion to Dismiss. Further, Defendant's 15 Motionfor Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Out of Time is granted. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 04/11/2014. (mg)
July 7, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying in part and granting in part Defendant's 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 07/07/2014. (mg)
September 19, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Supplemental Disclosures; and finding as moot 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Required Initial Disclosures. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37( c)(1), Defendant is hereby prohibited from using any witness who is not already listed in either its December 13, 2013 Initial Disclosures, May 22, 2014 supplemented disclosures, or August 26, 2014 Supplemental Disclosures to supply evidence on a mot ion, at a hearing, or at trial, unless Defendant makes a showing that its failure to disclose such witness was substantially justified or is harmless. To the extent that Defendant has a last known address and telephone number for the former employees listed in its Supplemental Disclosures, it shall provide this information to Plaintiff within 14 days of the date of this Order or advise Plaintiff that it does not have such information. It is further ordered that on or before 10/10/2014, Pl aintiff shall file an affidavit itemizing the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, Plaintiff incurred in making the 34 Motion to Compel Defendant's Supplemental Disclosures. Defendant shall have until 10/24/2014, to file a response to the affidavit. The Court will then issue a second order, specifying the amount and time of payment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/19/2014. (byk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rogers v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Cassandra L. Writz(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelli F. Rogers
Represented By: Todd E. Shadid(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joslyn M. Kusiak(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michelle L. Brenwald-Johnson(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]