Kelly et al v. City of Fort Thomas, Kentucky et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Kelly and William Sheffield
Defendant: City of Fort Thomas, Kentucky, Mary Brown, Barbara Runge, James Doepker, Roger Peterman, Barbara Thompson-Levine, Tom Lampe and Eric Haas
Case Number: 2:2008cv00054
Filed: March 24, 2008
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Campbell
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER; 1)Pla's 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction should be denied; 2)Oral findings and conclusions made at the conclusion of the hearing held on 11/21/2008, are also incorporated herein by reference. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/24/2008.(LSG)cc: COR
January 8, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Based on the foregoing analysis of the issues presented by the parties, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) The Defendants' motion for summary judgment is DENIED regarding the issue of where § 91.5 1 is preempted by state law. With respect to all other issues presented, the Defendants' motion for summary judgment 22 is GRANTED. (2) All state law claims asserted against the Mayor and Council Members in their individual capacities are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/8/2009.(JMM)cc: COR
April 23, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' motion to amend or alter 49 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/23/2009.(JMM)cc: COR
April 23, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' motion for declaratory judgment 50 is DENIED. The Defendants' motion for summary judgment 22 on the issue of whether O rdinance § 91.51 is preempted by state law is GRANTED. All issues having been resolved, a final and appealable judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/23/2009.(JMM)cc: COR Modified on 4/24/2009 (to correct text of docket entry) (JMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. City of Fort Thomas, Kentucky et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kelly
Represented By: John Gerard Patten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sheffield
Represented By: John Gerard Patten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fort Thomas, Kentucky
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Runge
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Doepker
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Peterman
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Thompson-Levine
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Lampe
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Haas
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]