Algie v. Northern Kentucky University

Plaintiff: Douglas J. Algie
Defendant: Northern Kentucky University
Case Number: 2:2008cv00109
Filed: June 17, 2008
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Covington Office
County: Campbell
Presiding Judge: David L. Bunning
Referring Judge: Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS RECOMMENDED: (1) Pltf's 37 MOTION for Sanctions against the defendant filed by Douglas J. Algie be denied; (2) Def's 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Northern Kentucky University be granted and that this matter be stricken from the active docket of this court; (3) Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2009. Any responses to the Objections due 10 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman on 10/19/2009.(ECO)cc: COR
January 4, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER; 1)Pla's 50 Objections to the Mag's Report and Recommendation are Overfulled; 2)Magistrate's 48 Report and Recommendations is adopted as the findings of fact and conclusions of law of the Court; 3)Pla's 37 M OTION for Sanctions are denied; 4)Def's, 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment is Granted; 5)Matter is Stricken from the docket of the court; 6)Judgment in favor of Def will be entered contemporaneously. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 12/31/2009. (LST)cc: COR
October 17, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER; 1)Pla's 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed IFP is denied as moot; 2)Pla's Title VII retaliation claims stemming from the filing of 6/1/2005 EEOC Charge and filing of Cov. Civ 06-cv-23 are dismissed w/prejudice; 3)Pl a's Title VII employment discrimination claims relating to alleged med. disability are dismissed w/out prejudice; 4)Pla's claims re: alleged discrimination on or after 4/10/07, through and including his termination in 9/07 may proceed; 5)Cl erk to issue summons for the Office of the Vice President for Legal Affairs & General Counsel; 6)Pla to be responsible for proper service of summons and complaint, paying particular attention to all applicable provisions of Fed. R. Civ.P.4; 7)Pla to keep Clerk of Court informed of current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal; 8)For every further pleading or other doc pla submits for consideration, pla to serve upon each def, or if appearance has been entered by counsel, eac h attorney, a copy of the pleading or doc. Pla to send original papers to Clerk of Court w/a certificate stating the date a true and correct copy of the doc was mailed to each def or counsel. If a District Judge or Mag. Judge receives any document which has not been filed with the Clerk or which has been filed but fails to include the certificate of service of copies, the doc will be disregarded; 9)Case referred to Mag. Judge J. Gregory Wehrman for all further proceedings and disposition, and is no longer referred to the Pro Se Office. Clerk to make appropriate administrative referral notations in the CM/ECF docket sheet. Signed by David L. Bunning on 10/17/2008.(LSG)cc: COR
February 20, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) NKU's Motion for Summary Judgment on Ptff's FMLA Claim 75 is granted ; 2) Ptff's FMLA retaliation claim is dismissed ; 3) This matter is stricken from the docket; 4) A Judgment in favor of NKU will be entered contemporaneously herewith. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/20/2013.(TJZ)cc: COR, Ptff Doug Algie via US Mail

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Algie v. Northern Kentucky University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas J. Algie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Kentucky University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]