Vaughan v. Brigham

Plaintiff: Michael Dean Vaughan
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Brigham
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00005
Filed: February 16, 2010
 
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Frankfort Office
County: Franklin
Referring Judge: Pro Se
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Plaintiff Michael Vaughans Renewed Motion for Default Judgment [Record No. 52] is DENIED. 2) The Clerk is directed to SET ASIDE the previous entry of default [Record No. 15]. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/21/2011.(AKR)cc: COR, plaintiff
July 5, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Plaintiff Michael Vaughan's action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. 2. Plaintiff's pending motions (Record Nos. 74 , 75 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/5/2011.(CBD)cc: COR
July 5, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: 1. Plaintiff's complaint 2 is DISMISSED, with prejudice. 2. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. 3. This matter is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Courts docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/5/2011.(CBD)cc: COR
July 15, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Plaintiff Michael Vaughan's Motion for Reconsideration 78 is DENIED. 2. Vaughans Emergency Ex Parte Motion 79 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/15/2011.(CBD)cc: Pro Se Pltf & COR (ent PC/SKV) on 7/15/2011 (CBD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vaughan v. Brigham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dean Vaughan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Brigham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]