Carrollton Hospitality, LLC et al v. Insight Kentucky Partners II, L.P.

Plaintiff: Lloyd D. Abdoo, Holiday Host, LLC, Carrollton Hospitality, LLC and Carrollton Host Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Insight Kentucky Partners II, L.P.
Counter_claimant: Insight Kentucky Partners II, L.P.
Counter_defendant: Carrollton Hospitality, LLC, Carrollton Host Enterprises, LLC and Holiday Host, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00021
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Frankfort Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: Gregory F. VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (R. 22 ) is DENIED, and; 2. Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a sur response (R. 25 ) in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to remand is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 10/31/2013.(AKR)cc: COR
November 19, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that Plaintiffs' Motion for a Jury Trial 20 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 11/19/2013.(AKR)cc: COR
June 3, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendant Insight's Motion for Summary Judgment 31 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 2. Defendant Insights motion for summary judgment on all claims alleged against it by Plaintiffs is GRANTED, and all cl aims alleged in the Plaintiffs Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3. Defendant Insights motion for summary judgment on its Counterclaims against Plaintiffs is GRANTED as to Counts I, II, III, IV, V, VI, and VII, but is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the amount of damages; 4. Judgment having been granted for Insight on its Counterclaims, and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §2201(a) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 57, the following agreements are declared valid and enforceable, and the provisions of these agreements are binding on the parties thereto: (a) Standard Hotel Agreement between Insight and Carrollton Hospitality, LLC, dated March 10, 2011 ("CHL Standard Hotel Agreement") (b) Standard Hotel Agreement between Insight and C arrollton Host Enterprises, LLC, dated March 10, 2011 ("CHE Standard Hotel Agreement") (c) Standard Hotel Agreement between Insight and Carrollton Holiday Inn Express, dated March 10, 2011 ("HHL Standard Hotel Agreement") 5. Insig ht, as the prevailing party, is allowed its costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1), and is awarded its reasonable attorney fees from Hospitality, Host, and Holiday, pursuant to each of the Standard Hotel Agreements at issue in this litigation; 6. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 32 on Counts I, III, and IV of Insights Counterclaim is DENIED; 7. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply 41 in opposition to Insight's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; and 8. This matter will remain on the Courts active docket pending resolution of the issue concerning damages, and thus the dates for the Final Pretrial Conference and the Jury Trial will remain as scheduled. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/3/2014.(CBD)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrollton Hospitality, LLC et al v. Insight Kentucky Partners II, L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd D. Abdoo
Represented By: Rick Holland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holiday Host, LLC
Represented By: Rick Holland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrollton Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Rick Holland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrollton Host Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Rick Holland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Kentucky Partners II, L.P.
Represented By: Culver V. Halliday
Represented By: Barry L. Dunn
Represented By: Samuel D. Hinkle, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Insight Kentucky Partners II, L.P.
Represented By: Barry L. Dunn
Represented By: Culver V. Halliday
Represented By: Samuel D. Hinkle, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Carrollton Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Rick Holland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Carrollton Host Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Rick Holland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Holiday Host, LLC
Represented By: Rick Holland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]