Taylor v. Simpson

 
Case Number: 5:2006cv00181
Filed: June 2, 2006
 
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Lexington Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer B Coffman
Referring Judge: Pro Se
 
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered, 1) 27 MOTION for Order for DNA testing funds or a hearing is DENIED, 2) 33 MOTION for Order to Expand the Record is GRANTED, 3) Simpson's attachments to DE 33 , specifically 33-3 through and including 33-8 are MADE PART OF THIS RECORD and Clerk is directed to note in the docket sheet that said attachments are officially part of this record. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 9/27/2010.(SCD)cc: COR
March 24, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that, 1) 45 MOTION for Discovery is GRANTED IN PART, and is limited to information relevant to his Batson claim. 2) W/in 90 days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall provide Taylor's counsel w t he following discovery, a) any and all notes, docs, memo or reports generated by the Commonwealth in connection w Taylor's voir dire, b) any and all notes re jury selection in all other cases prosecuted by Ernest Jasmin, c) any and all notes, do cs, memo, report, audio/video recordings, training materials or manuals re jury selection policies and practices utilized by the Jefferson County Commonwealth Attorney btwn the time Ernest Jasmin joined and the conclusion of Taylor's trial. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 3/23/2011.(SCD)cc: COR
February 6, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) Respondent Simpson's 58 Motion filed pursuant to FRCP 59, to Reconsider the 58 Order of March 23, 2011 is GRANTED. (2) The 57 Memorandum Opinion and Order of March 23, 2011 is VACATED and SET ASIDE. (3) Taylor's 45 Motion for Discovery under Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on February 6, 2012. (AWD) cc: COR
September 30, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. 2) With regard to appeal, a Certificate of Appealability will be issued for Ground 1. 3) This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. A judgment in conformity w this Memo Opinion & Order will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/30/2014.(SCD)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Taylor v. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]