Dublin Eye Associates, P.C. et al v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: James Y. Jones, Dublin Eye Associates, P.C. and Roger D. Smith
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company and Thomas Ackerman
Case Number: 5:2011cv00128
Filed: April 13, 2011
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Jennifer B Coffman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2013 227 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that Dfts' 175 Objections to Magistrate Judge Atkins' Order dated November 9, 2012 are OVERRULED, and Dfts shall produce the requested discovery in compliance with that Order NLT January 31, 2013. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on January 17, 2013.(AWD) cc: COR
February 8, 2013 259 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: (A) Plas' 212 MOTION for Leave to File Combined Reply Memorandum is GRANTED. (B) Plas' 163 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. (C) Plas' 165 MOTION to Amend the Scheduling Order and MOTION for Leave to File Third Verified Amended Complaint is DENIED. (D) Plas' 214 MOTION to extend fact discovery and expert witness deadlines remains, pending further orders of the Court. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on February 8, 2013. (AWD) cc: COR
February 21, 2013 270 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Plas' 244 Objections to Magistrate Judge Atkins' Order entered January 11, 2013 and 246 Objections to the January 22, 2013 Order are OVERRULED. The requested documents shall be produced NLT March 7, 2013. Plas' 261 MOTION for a Status Conference regarding the objections is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on February 21, 2013.(AWD) cc: COR
August 31, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) GRANTING Massachusetts Mutual's 19 MOTION to Dismiss state law claims; (2) GRANTING IN PART & DENYING IN PART pla's 22 MOTION for Leave to File Verified Amended Complaint; Dublin Eye shall be permitted t o file the vertified amended complaint but shall within 10 days file a second verified amended complaint consistent with the court's opinion, removing all claims for punitive damages under Count 1. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 8/31/11.(KJR)cc: COR
July 12, 2013 352 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: (A) Dfts' 265 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (B)All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. (C) Judgment will be entered contemporaneously with this Opinion and Order. (D) This case is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on July 12, 2013. (AWD) cc: COR
February 21, 2014 367 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Plas' 354 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on February 21, 2014. (AWD) cc: COR
March 24, 2014 372 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Dfts' 358 and 359 MOTIONS for Attorney Fees are GRANTED. This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Atkins for a report and recommendation on the specific amount of fees to be awarded. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell for Judge Karl S. Forester on March 24, 2014. (AWD) cc: COR
June 9, 2014 384 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Pla's 375 Motion to Reconsider and to Set Aside the Court's March 24, 2014 Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on June 9, 2014. (AWD) cc: COR
October 9, 2014 408 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) The 401 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Atkins is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART. (2) Pla's 404 Objections to the R/R are OVERRULED IN PART. (3) Pla's 370 Motion to Review the Clerk's Taxation of Costs is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (4) The taxable costs awarded to each Dft for shipment of deposition transcripts shall be reduced as follows: $590.95 attributed to Mass Mutual; $320.68 attrib uted to Ackerman; and $138 attributed to QPS, Chatfield and Shea collectively. (5) Dfts' are directed to provide itemized invoices for depositions shipped by Todd & Associates Reporting within 5 days. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on October 9, 2014. (AWD) cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dublin Eye Associates, P.C. et al v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Y. Jones
Represented By: Jessica K. Case
Represented By: Joe F. Childers
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dublin Eye Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Joe F. Childers
Represented By: Jessica K. Case
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger D. Smith
Represented By: Jessica K. Case
Represented By: Joe F. Childers
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ackerman
Represented By: Barry D. Hunter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]