Haffey et al v. Gentry Mechanical Systems, Inc. et al

Defendant: State Farm Bank, F.S.B., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Americas, Gentry Mechanical Systems, Inc. and Patricia Kelleher
Plaintiff: Shane M. Haffey
Case Number: 5:2011cv00188
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Jennifer B Coffman
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that Deutsche Bank's motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED; that Shane Haffey's motion for extension of time to respond to the motion is GRANTED & the clerk shall docket the response in Case No. 08-459; that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE & STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 3/2/12.(KJR)cc: COR
October 3, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: DENYING Haffey's 33 MOTION to Alter or Amend the 32 Judgment on the Pleadings by Shane M. Haffey(as a Relator Qui Tam )Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 10/3/12.(KJR)cc: COR,Haffey
December 20, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that Haffey's 47 Motion to Vacate orders in relation to the automatic stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 12/20/2012. (SCD)cc: COR,Haffey(via US Mail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haffey et al v. Gentry Mechanical Systems, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Bank, F.S.B.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Christopher E. Thorsen
Represented By: Jonathan D. Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentry Mechanical Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kelleher
Represented By: Jonathan D. Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane M. Haffey
Represented By: Heather M. McKeever
Represented By: Heather M. McKeever
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]