Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC v. McKinney et al

Plaintiff: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Defendant: Louise Wagers McCord Trust B, Spencer Drug, LLC, John McKinney and Mary Ann McKinney
Counter_claimant: John McKinney and Mary Ann McKinney
Counter_defendant: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00025
Filed: January 25, 2013
 
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Lexington Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Karl S. Forester
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 37 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Dft Spencer Drug's 11 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; Defendant Trust's 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 4/15/2013. (STB)cc: COR
April 16, 2013 38 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: (1) CVS' 15 Motion to Expedite discovery GRANTED; (2) parties shall serve requests for production of documents w/in 7 days; (3) Responses to those requests shall be due w/in 14 days after service; (4) all party depositions shall be completed w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 4/16/2013. (STB)cc: COR
September 20, 2013 72 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Plt's 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 9/20/2013. (STC)cc: COR
September 26, 2013 73 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Spencer Drug's 34 Motion to Dismiss amended complaint is GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that CVS's claim for unfair competition (Count VIII) is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 9/26/2013. (STC)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC v. McKinney et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Wagers McCord Trust B
Represented By: Gregory K. Puckett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Drug, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia L. Effinger
Represented By: Thomas D. Flanigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McKinney
Represented By: James T. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann McKinney
Represented By: James T. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: John McKinney
Represented By: James T. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Mary Ann McKinney
Represented By: James T. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]