Bowling v. Haeberlin

 
Case Number: 6:2003cv00028
Filed: January 15, 2003
 
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: London Office
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Referring Judge: Robert E. Wier
 
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 245 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Bowling's petition for the writ of habeas corpus, R. 1, is DENIED for Claims 1, 5, 6, 8, 9A, 9B, 9D, 10, 11, 12, 14, 17, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 27, 28, 29, 30, 31, 32, 34, 35A, 35B, 35D, 35F, 35H, 36, 39, 44, 49, 56, 65, 68, and the First Amendment to his Petition. The Court will issue a separate opinion addressing the remainder of Bowling's claims. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 6/26/12.(SYD)cc: COR
September 28, 2012 259 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, Motions terminated: ORDERED that Bowling's petition for the writ of habeas corpus, R. 1 , is DENIED for Claims 2, 3, 4, 13, 15, 18, 19, 20, 45, 46, 47, 48, 50, 51, 53, 54, 55, 57, 58, 59, 60, 61, and 67. It is further ORDERED that Bowling's evidentiary motions, R. 118 , R. 120 , R. 166 , and R. 188 , are DENIED. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 9/28/2012.(RBB)cc: COR
March 21, 2013 275 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : (1) Petitioner Ronnie Bowling's Motion for Reconsideration, R. 262 , is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. (2) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2), Bowling is GRANTED a Certificate of Appealability on Claims 6 and 36, R. 262 at 56. The question on appeal is limited to the same issue in Wheeler: Whether Kentucky's statutory scheme for proportionality review of capital sentences is constitutional. (3) Bowing is DENIED a Certificate of Appealability for all his other claims. R. 262 at 726. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 3/21/13.(SYD)cc: COR, srv

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bowling v. Haeberlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]