Hampton v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Veronica Hampton
Case Number: 6:2013cv00039
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: London Office
County: Laurel
Presiding Judge: David L. Bunning
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Doc. # 22 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/25/2013.(RBB)cc: COR
August 5, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: for the reasons stated; ORDERED that (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 36 ) is granted; and (2) Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant contemporaneously with this opinion. Case Terminated. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/5/2014.(RBB)cc: COR
August 5, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 36 ) is hereby granted; (2) This matter is dismissed with prejudice and stricken from the active docket of the Court; and; (3) This is a final and appealable order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/5/2014.(RBB)cc: COR
May 3, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. # 3 ) is DENIED. Pursuant to Rules 16 and 26, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that (1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of service of th is Order, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone; (2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: a. proposed discovery plan; b. parties' estimate of time necess ary to file pretrial motions; c. parties' belief as to whether matter is suitable for some form of alternative dispute resolution such as mediation; d. parties' estimate as to probable length of trial; e. whether parties consent to the pers iding magistrate judge for all purposes; Should parties find that a joint report is not possible, parties shall each file individual reports which the Court shall entertain for purposes of setting out its scheduling order. ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/4/2013.) Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 5/3/2013.(RBB)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Heather M. McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Hampton
Represented By: John F. Kelley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.