Coulter v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Penny K. Coulter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00011
Filed: January 30, 2013
 
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Bowling Green Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 8/1/2013. For the foregoing reasons, this matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for a new decision and further administrative proceedings regarding the current availability of jobs in the national economy that Plaintiff can still perform despite her impairments and for reconsideration Plaintiffs ability to reach overhead and use of her left upper extremity in light of the treating source medical opinions. cc: Counsel (TJD)
December 11, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/11/2013 granting 16 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $2,137.50 and costs in the amount of $24.00. Plaintiff's motion for leave to re-docket (DN 16 ) is DEN IED. Plaintiff's request that the Court conditionally direct the payment of fees to her counsel, Mary G. Burchett-Bower, is DENIED. To the extent this fee is duplicative of the fee awarded Plaintiff's counsel under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b ), counsel will reimburse the Plaintiff. In the event the proceedings on remand result in the award and payment of benefits to the Plaintiff, the Court will then consider a motion to re-docket the case for consideration of a fee for services under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Final and appealable Order. cc: Counsel (CDR)
August 19, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 8/18/2014; the United States Attorney shall respond to the fee petition within 30 days from the entry of this Order including a statement of accrued benefits and its position on whether the requested fee is reasonable. cc:counsel (DAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coulter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny K. Coulter
Represented By: Mary G. Burchett-Bower
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Brady Miller
Represented By: Regina S. Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]