Crouch et al v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Larry Crouch, Rhonda Mae Crouch, Teddy Lee Hudson and Carolyn Sue Hudson
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc., Textron Inc, Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc., John Jewell Aircraft, Inc., Aircraft Specialties Services, Inc., Crankcase Services USA, Ltd., Mike's Aircraft Fuel Metering Service, Inc., Electronics International, Inc. and George A. Durham, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00638
Filed: November 19, 2007
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Graves
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Simpson
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Airline Crash
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/25/09;denying with leave to reinstate 41 Motion to Dismiss; 68 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 84 Motion to Dismiss; 25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; parties granted 90 days from entry of this order to engage in jurisdictional discovery; parties may refile their dismissal motions upon expiration of ltd discovery period. cc:counsel (MLG)
January 29, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 1/28/2010 re 147 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc., and 149 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by John Jewell Aircraft, Inc. Court will issue a separate Order in accordance with this Opinion.cc: Counsel, pro se Defendant (RLK) Modified on 1/29/2010: cc (RLK).
July 12, 2010 208 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/9/2010 re 168 Motion for Summary Judgment. A separate order will issue in conformance with this opinion. cc: Counsel (AEP)
November 1, 2010 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 10/29/2010 re 211 MOTION for Reconsideration of 208 Memorandum Opinion and 209 Order. For the reasons set forth, the portions of the the prior Opinion that do not conform with this Opinion will be stricken, and AVCO's Motion for Summary Judgment will be GRANTED. A separate Order will issue in accordance with this Opinion.cc: Counsel; Defendant Durham, pro se (RLK) Modified on 11/1/2010: cc (RLK).
August 17, 2011 247 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/16/11; Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint will be denied; The plaintiff's motion for reconsideration will be denied; A separate order will issue in accordance with this opinion. cc:counsel (JBM)
April 30, 2012 273 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 4/27/12; re 263 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint; motion to file a third-party complaint will be granted by separate order.cc:counsel (MLG)
June 28, 2012 280 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/27/2012; 276 motion for clarification of Rule 54(b) certification set forth in this courts order of November 1, 2010 is GRANTED. The conclusions rendered in this Memorandum Opinion and Order are provided to clarify the Rule 54(b)certification in the order of this court entered November 1, 2010.cc:counsel (TLB)
September 17, 2013 327 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge James D. Moyer on 9/17/2013 granting in part and denying in part 318 Motion for Protective Order. The court will DENY plaintiffs motion with respect to requests for admission numbers 9, 15-19, 21-29, 31-41, and 45-48, but will otherwise GRANT the motion. Plaintiffs shall have thirty days from the date of entry of this order to admit or deny each request for admission identified above. cc:counsel (DAK)
September 30, 2014 379 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge James D. Moyer on 9/30/2014; Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 1/9/2015. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 10/31/2014. Daubert Motion due by 2/27/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 4/10/2015. 357 Motion to Stay, 364 Motion to Strike, 377 Motion for Hearing 331 Motion to Strike DENIED AS MOOT without prejudice to to re-file similar motions should circustamces warrant. cc: Counsel(TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crouch et al v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Crouch
Represented By: Jerome P. Prather
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Mae Crouch
Represented By: Jerome P. Prather
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Lee Hudson
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sue Hudson
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jewell Aircraft, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aircraft Specialties Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crankcase Services USA, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike's Aircraft Fuel Metering Service, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronics International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Durham, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]