Hartley et al v. Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A. et al

Plaintiff: Edwin Hartley and Michelle Hartley
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America and Yamaha Motor Corporation, Ltd.
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00144
Filed: March 4, 2009
 
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Tort Product Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jennifer B. Coffman
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding 45 the parties' Stipulation for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF) [Transferred from ned on 3/4/2009.]
February 13, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Multidistrict Litigation Panel, Docket No. 2016; case will be transferred to USDC-Western District of Kentucky. (Clerk to wait to transfer file until receipt of certified copy of order from district court handling MDL docket.) (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal Email) (JAE) [Transferred from ned on 3/4/2009.]
March 3, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Western District of Kentucky, Docket No. 2016; Case is transferred to USDC-Western District of Kentucky. (Attachments: # 1 transmittal letter) (KBJ) [Transferred from ned on 3/4/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hartley et al v. Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Hartley
Represented By: John A. Sharp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hartley
Represented By: John A. Sharp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A.
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]