Maxwell's Pic-Pac, Inc. et al v. Vance et al

Intervenor_defendant: Liquor Outlet, LLC, d/b/a The Party Source
Plaintiff: Maxwell's Pic-Pac, Inc. and Food With Wine Coalition, Inc.
Defendant: Robert Vance, Tony Dehner and Danny Reed
Case Number: 3:2011cv00018
Filed: January 10, 2011
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 7/9/2014 ; case and all claims in it are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.cc:counsel (TLB)
August 14, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 8/13/12; the Courtconcludes, that should the Statute pass constitutional muster under the Fourteenth Amendment, it is not invalid due to an unconstitutional delegation of legislative authority. The Court will enter an order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion.cc:counsel (DAK)
October 3, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 70 Motion to Stay Absent a Bond. The Court will stay enforcement of its Memorandum Opinion and Order dated 8/13/2012, until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 10/3/12. cc:counsel (JBM)
March 13, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 3/12/2013; 68 Motion for Attorney Fees; Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys fees in the amount of$208,990 and costs in the amount of $11,706.94 cc:counsel (TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell's Pic-Pac, Inc. et al v. Vance et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Liquor Outlet, LLC, d/b/a The Party Source
Represented By: Kevin L. Chlarson
Represented By: Kenneth S. Handmaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell's Pic-Pac, Inc.
Represented By: Merrill S. Schell
Represented By: M. Stephen Pitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food With Wine Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Merrill S. Schell
Represented By: M. Stephen Pitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vance
Represented By: Peter Frank Ervin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Dehner
Represented By: Peter Frank Ervin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Reed
Represented By: Peter Frank Ervin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]