Lancaster et al v. Daymar Colleges Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rebecca Lancaster, Charles Larison, Emmanuel Quarles, Vixen Brumback, Khristina Cardona, Jason Hillerich, Cynthia Davis, Magen Goodlet, Dewayne Porter, Gregory Schulz, Karla Mattingly, Phyllis Porter, Cary Lockard, Contessa Speaks, Jeremy Wright, Valarie Constant, Michele Lockard, Lydia Bush, Chuwana Simpson, Heather Downs, Gisela Coleman, Jeromy Heath, Karen Heath, Christina Tobin, Joanna Fenn, William Bolin, Mark Cundiff, Da'rrell Jones, Kara Moore, Keiana Hayden, Rebecca Durham, Marjorie Thompson, Jennifer Gearhart, Eugenia Rabb, Shayne Spurgeon, D'Aundra Wilson, Mary Stinson, Demetrius Lindsey and Kenneth Carlucci
Defendant: Daymar Colleges Group, LLC, Daymar Learning of Paducah, Inc, Daymar Learning of Ohio, Inc, Mark A. Gabis, Daymar Learning, Inc and The Daymar Foundation, Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv00157
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 06/14/2011 re 7 MOTION to Supplement, 6 Motion for Discovery, Motion to Hold in Abeyance, 10 MOTION to Remand. Plaintiffs shall have 15 days to amend complaint Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2011. Supplemental briefs due within 15 days of filing of amended complaint. cc:counsel (CSD)
February 15, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 10 Motion to Remand; denying 37 Motion to Compel; Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2012 at 2:30 PM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 2/14/2012. cc:counsel (KJA)
March 14, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/13/2012. cc:counsel (KJA)
April 6, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell granting (25) Motion to Stay; case STAYED until 6th Circuit declines plaintiffs appeal or decides it merits; telephonic conference of 4/9/12 is Cancelled. Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-00573-TBR, 3:11-cv-00157-TBR, 5:11-cv-00036-TBRcc:counsel (MLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster et al v. Daymar Colleges Group, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lancaster
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Larison
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Quarles
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vixen Brumback
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khristina Cardona
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hillerich
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Davis
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magen Goodlet
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Porter
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Schulz
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Mattingly
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Porter
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Lockard
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contessa Speaks
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wright
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Constant
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Lockard
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Bush
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuwana Simpson
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Downs
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisela Coleman
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeromy Heath
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Heath
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Tobin
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Fenn
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bolin
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Cundiff
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Da'rrell Jones
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Moore
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keiana Hayden
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Durham
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Thompson
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gearhart
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenia Rabb
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayne Spurgeon
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Aundra Wilson
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Stinson
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Lindsey
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Carlucci
Represented By: David G. Bryant
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Represented By: Kenneth L. Sales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daymar Colleges Group, LLC
Represented By: R. Kenyon Meyer
Represented By: Emily Wang Zahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daymar Learning of Paducah, Inc
Represented By: R. Kenyon Meyer
Represented By: Emily Wang Zahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daymar Learning of Ohio, Inc
Represented By: R. Kenyon Meyer
Represented By: Emily Wang Zahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Gabis
Represented By: R. Kenyon Meyer
Represented By: Emily Wang Zahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daymar Learning, Inc
Represented By: R. Kenyon Meyer
Represented By: Emily Wang Zahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Daymar Foundation, Inc
Represented By: Jon L. Fleischaker
Represented By: Michael Merrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]