Securities and Exchange Commission v. Carroll et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Patrick M. Carroll, James P. Carroll, William T. Carroll, David A. Stitt, John P. Monroe, Stephen Somers, David Mark Calcutt and Christopher T. Calcutt
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00165
Filed: March 17, 2011
 
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 12/9/2011; re 94 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 96 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Hearing, 95 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, Order on Motion for Hearing, 93 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss for improper venue under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) is DENIED.cc:counsel (KJA)
August 8, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 8/7/13 - 149 Somers motion to compel is SUSTAINED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 152 The SECs motion for a protective order is SUSTAINED and Somers is barred from pursuing discovery concerning the basis for the SECs two press releases; 161 the SECs motion for leave to file an amended complaint is SUSTAINED. cc:counsel (DAK)
March 24, 2014 186 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 3/21/2014; 174 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. cc:counsel (TLB)
November 9, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER aigned by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 11/8/2011. For the reasons set forth, 40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is DENIED. The Court will address the Calcutts' other motions to dismiss, along with motions filed by their co-defendants, in separate memorandum opinion and orders. This is not a final order. cc: Counsel (AEP)
November 23, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 11/23/2011. For the reasons set forth, 23 , 35 , 37 , 38 , 39 , 43 , 84 Motions to Sever are DENIED. The Court will consider David and Christopher Calcutt's motion to dismiss for improper venue in a separate memorandum opinion and order. cc: Counsel (AEP)
November 23, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 11/23/2011. For the reasons set forth, 22 , 30 , 32 , 33 , 34 , and 85 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED. The Court will address the remaining outstanding motions in separate memorandum opinions and orders. cc: Counsel (AEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Carroll et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: James A. Davidson
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Daniel J. Hayes
Represented By: Jason Andrew Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Carroll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Carroll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Carroll
Represented By: Amy J. Hansen
Represented By: Daniel Lynch
Represented By: Theodore S. Shouse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Stitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Monroe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Somers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mark Calcutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher T. Calcutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]